Name-Surname
Real Person Acting on Behalf of Legal Person Member
Gender
Title
Profession
The First Election Date To Board
Whether Executive Director or Not
Positions Held in the Company in the Last 5 Years
Current Positions Held Outside the Company
Whether the Director has at Least 5 Years’ Experience on Audit, Accounting and/or Finance or not
Share in Capital (%)
The Share Group that the Board Member Representing
Independent Board Member or not
Link To PDP Notification That Includes The Independency Declaration
Whether the Independent Director Considered By The Nomination Committee
Whether She/He is the Director Who Ceased to Satisfy The Independence or Not
Committees Charged and Task
CAN YÜCEL
Male
Chairman of the Board
Banker
21/03/2023
Non-Executive
Chairman of the Board
T. İş Bankası A.Ş. Deputy General Manager, Türkiye Şişe ve Cam Fabrikaları A.Ş. Member of the Board of Directors, Chairman of the Board of Joint Stock Company İşbank
Yes
Dependent Member
MURAT KARLUK ÇETİNKAYA
Male
Deputy Chairman of the Board
Civil Engineer
10/07/2020
Non-Executive
Vice Chairman and Board Member
Division Manager of Construction and Real Estate Management Department of İşbank; Board Member of İş Portföy Yönetimi A.Ş
Yes
Dependent Member
ÖMER BARLAS ÜLKÜ
Male
Member of the Board
Banker
31/07/2023
Executive
Group Head, Assistant General Manager
Vice Chairman at Kanyon Yönetim İşletim ve Pazarlama A.Ş., Chairman at Kasaba Gayrimenkul İnşaat Taahhüt ve Ticaret A.Ş.
Yes
Dependent Member
ÖZCAL KORKMAZ
Male
Member of the Board
Sworn-in Certified Public Accountant
29/04/2020
Non-Executive
Board Member
Yes
Dependent Member
MURAT DOĞAN
Male
Member of the Board
Banker
08/12/2014
Non-Executive
Board Member
Affiliates Department Manager at T. İş Bankası A.Ş., Board Member at Türkiye Sınai Kalkınma Bankası A.Ş., Trakya Yatırım Holding A.Ş. ve İş Enerji Yatırımları A.Ş., Vice Chairman at Maxis Girişim Sermayesi Portföy Yönetimi A.Ş. ve Kasaba Gayrimenkul İnşaat Taahhüt ve Ticaret A.Ş., Chairman at İş Yenilenebilir Enerji Proje Yönetimi Danışmanlık A.Ş., Batı Karadeniz Elektrik Dağıtım ve Ticaret A.Ş. ve Casaba Yönetim İşletim İm. İth. İhr. Paz. Tem. Güv. Ulaş. Tic. ve San. A.Ş.
Yes
Dependent Member
Member of the Corporate Governance Committee and Early Detection of Risk Committee
VAHİDE UYAR
Female
Member of the Board
Banker
26/03/2024
Non-Executive
Retail Loans Department Manager at Türkiye İş Bankası A.Ş
Retail Loans Department Manager at Türkiye İş Bankası A.Ş.
Yes
Dependent Member
Member of Corporate Governance Committee and Committee on Early Risk Detection
OĞUZ CEM ÇELİK
Male
Member of the Board
Academician
23/03/2022
Non-Executive
Independent Board Member
Faculty member at Istanbul Technical University, Faculty of Architecture, Department of Structural and Earthquake Engineering, Member of New Building Technologies Board within the scope of Turkish National Risk Shield Model
No
Independent Member
https://www.kap.org.tr/tr/Bildirim/1257954
Considered
No
Chairman of the Committee for Audit
İLKAY ARIKAN
Male
Member of the Board
Adviser
23/03/2022
Non-Executive
Independent Board Member
Aktio Danışmanlık Co-Founder and Independent Board Member of Global Menkul Değerler A.Ş.
Yes
Independent Member
https://www.kap.org.tr/tr/Bildirim/1257954
Considered
No
Chairman of the Corporate Governance Committee, Member of the Committee for Audit
MEHMET GÖKPINAR
Male
Member of the Board
Other
26/03/2024
Non-Executive
Independent Board Member
No
Independent Member
https://www.kap.org.tr/tr/Bildirim/1257954
Considered
No
Chairman of the Early Detection of Risk Committee