Name-Surname
|
Person Who Behaves On Behalf Of Legal Person Board Member
|
Gender
|
Title
|
Profession
|
The First Election Date To Board
|
Whether Executive Director or Not
|
Positions Held in the Company in the Last 5 Years
|
Current Positions Held Outside the Company
|
Whether the Director has at Least 5 Years'' Experience on Audit, Accounting and/or Finance or not
|
Share in Capital (%)
|
The Share Group that the Board Member Representing
|
Independent Board Member or not
|
Link To PDP Notification That Includes The Independency Declaration
|
Whether the Independent Director Considered By The Nomination Committee
|
Whether She/He is the Director Who Ceased to Satisfy The Independence or Not
|
Committees Charged and Task
|
MEHMET ÖMER KOÇ
|
|
Male
|
Chairman of the Board
|
Businessman / Businesswoman
|
26.01.2006
|
Non-Executive
|
Yönetim Kurulu Başkanlığı
|
Chairman of The Koç Holding and The Board Membership of The Koç Group Companies
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Yürütme Komitesi Başkanı
|
YILDIRIM ALİ KOÇ
|
|
Male
|
Deputy Chairman of the Board
|
Businessman / Businesswoman
|
27.03.2009
|
Non-Executive
|
Yönetim Kurulu Başkan Vekili
|
Vice Chairman of The Koç Holding and The Board Membership of The Koç Group Companies
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Yürütme Komitesi Üyesi
|
MUSTAFA RAHMİ KOÇ
|
|
Male
|
Member of the Board
|
Businessman / Businesswoman
|
04.06.2008
|
Non-Executive
|
The Board Member
|
Honorary Chairman of Koç Holding and Board Membership for Koç Group Companies
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Executive Committee Member
|
SEMAHAT SEVİM ARSEL
|
|
Female
|
Member of the Board
|
Businessman / Businesswoman
|
27.03.2009
|
Non-Executive
|
Yönetim Kurulu Üyeliği
|
The Board Membership of The Koç Group Companies
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Executive Committee Member
|
LEVENT ÇAKIROĞLU
|
|
Male
|
Member of the Board
|
Businessman / Businesswoman
|
30.03.2015
|
Non-Executive
|
The Board Member
|
The Board Membership of The Koç Group Companies and Koç Holding CEO
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
-
|
EROL MEMİOĞLU
|
|
Male
|
Member of the Board
|
Businessman / Businesswoman
|
26.01.2006
|
Non-Executive
|
Yönetim Kurulu Üyeliği
|
The Board Membership of The Koç Group Companies
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Risk Yönetimi Komitesi Üyesi
|
YAĞIZ EYÜBOĞLU
|
|
Male
|
Member of the Board
|
Businessman / Businesswoman
|
04.04.2016
|
Non-Executive
|
Yönetim Kurulu Üyeliği
|
The Board Membership of The Koç Group Companies and President of Energy Group
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
|
Corporate Governance Committee
|
SALİM ARDA ERMUT
|
|
Male
|
Member of the Board
|
Manager
|
08.06.2021
|
Non-Executive
|
|
Turkey Wealth Fund General Manager and Member of the Board of Directors
|
|
|
|
Dependent Member
|
|
|
|
|
MUHARREM HİLMİ KAYHAN
|
|
Male
|
Member of the Board
|
Businessman / Businesswoman
|
21.03.2018
|
Non-Executive
|
Bağımsız Yönetim Kurulu Üyeliği
|
Vice Chairman of the Board of SÖKTAŞ
|
Yes
|
|
|
Independent Member
|
https://www.kap.org.tr/tr/Bildirim/915313
|
Considered
|
No
|
Denetim Komitesi Başkanı, Kurumsal Yönetim Komitesi Başkanı
|
AYŞE CANAN EDİBOĞLU
|
|
Female
|
Member of the Board
|
Businessman / Businesswoman
|
21.03.2018
|
Non-Executive
|
Yönetim Kurulu Üyeliği
|
Independent Board Member at ING Bank
|
|
|
|
Independent Member
|
https://www.kap.org.tr/tr/Bildirim/741472
|
Considered
|
No
|
Risk Yönetim Komitesi Başkanı
|
KAMİL ÖMER BOZER
|
|
Male
|
Member of the Board
|
Businessman / Businesswoman
|
21.03.2018
|
Non-Executive
|
Bağımsız Yönetim Kurulu Üyeliği
|
Board Member at Coca-Cola İçecek, Adel Kalemcilik Ticaret ve Sanayi A.Ş., Kamil Yazıcı Yönetim ve Danışma A.Ş, Anadolu Isuzu and the Boyner Group, as the Advisor to the Board of Dierectors of Anadolu Etap, and as an Independent Board Member at Söktaş Tekstil A.Ş. and Arçelik A.Ş.
|
Yes
|
|
|
Independent Member
|
https://www.kap.org.tr/tr/Bildirim/915313
|
Considered
|
No
|
Denetim Komitesi Üyesi
|
MEHMET TUFAN ERGİNBİLGİÇ
|
|
Male
|
Member of the Board
|
Businessman / Businesswoman
|
31.03.2021
|
Non-Executive
|
|
Board Member at DCC plc ve CNH Industrial
|
|
|
|
Independent Member
|
https://www.kap.org.tr/tr/Bildirim/915313
|
Considered
|
No
|
-
|