Name-Surname
|
Person Who Behaves On Behalf Of Legal Person Board Member
|
Gender
|
Title
|
Profession
|
The First Election Date To Board
|
Whether Executive Director or Not
|
Positions Held in the Company in the Last 5 Years
|
Current Positions Held Outside the Company
|
Whether the Director has at Least 5 Years'' Experience on Audit, Accounting and/or Finance or not
|
Share in Capital (%)
|
The Share Group that the Board Member Representing
|
Independent Board Member or not
|
Link To PDP Notification That Includes The Independency Declaration
|
Whether the Independent Director Considered By The Nomination Committee
|
Whether She/He is the Director Who Ceased to Satisfy The Independence or Not
|
Committees Charged and Task
|
CENK ALPER
|
|
Male
|
Chairman of the Board
|
Manager
|
08.08.2019
|
Executive
|
|
|
Yes
|
|
|
Dependent Member
|
|
Not Considered
|
No
|
|
LAURENT CHARLES RENÉ VALLÉE
|
|
Male
|
Deputy Chairman of the Board
|
Manager
|
01.07.2019
|
Executive
|
|
|
Yes
|
|
|
Dependent Member
|
|
Not Considered
|
No
|
|
BARIŞ ORAN
|
|
Male
|
Member of the Board
|
Manager
|
27.03.2018
|
Non-Executive
|
|
Hacı Ömer Sabancı Holding A.Ş. CFO, SabancıDX Yönetim Kurulu Başkanı, Brisa Bridgestone Sabancı Lastik San. ve Tic. A.Ş. Yönetim Kurulu Üyesi, Enerjisa Enerji A.Ş. Yönetim Kurulu Üyesi, Enerjisa Üretim Santralleri A.Ş. Yönetim Kurulu Üyesi, Çimsa Çimento San. ve Tic. A.Ş. Yönetim Kurulu Üyesi, TÜSİAD Yönetim Kurulu Üyesi ve BÜMED Yönetim Kurulu Üyesi
|
Yes
|
|
|
Dependent Member
|
|
Not Considered
|
No
|
|
HAKAN TİMUR
|
|
Male
|
Member of the Board
|
Manager
|
27.03.2018
|
Non-Executive
|
|
Hacı Ömer Sabancı Holding A.Ş. İnsan Kaynakları Grup Başkanı, Hacı Ömer Sabancı Holding A.Ş. Yürütme Kurulu Üyesi, Afyon Çimento Sanayi T.A.Ş. Yönetim Kurulu Üyesi, Avivasa Emeklilik ve Hayat A.Ş. Yönetim Kurulu Üyesi ve Kurumsal Yönetim Komitesi Üyesi, Kordsa Global Yönetim Kurulu Üyesi ve Kurumsal Yönetim Kurulu Üyesi, Teknosa İç ve Dış Ticaret A.Ş. Yönetim Kurulu Başkan Yardımcısı, BİMSA (Dx) Yönetim Kurulu Başkan Vekili, Özel Sektör Gönüllüler Derneği (ÖSGD) Yönetim Kurulu Üyesi TÜSİAD Üyesi ve Yönetim Kurulu Üyeleri Derneği Üyesi
|
No
|
|
|
Dependent Member
|
|
Not Considered
|
No
|
Kurumsal Yönetim Komitesi Üyesi
|
TAMER SAKA
|
|
Male
|
Member of the Board
|
Manager
|
15.05.2019
|
Non-Executive
|
|
|
Yes
|
|
|
Dependent Member
|
|
Not Considered
|
No
|
|
SAADET RUBA UNKAN ERGENER
|
|
Female
|
Member of the Board
|
Manager
|
27.03.2018
|
Non-Executive
|
|
Hacı Ömer Sabancı Holding A.Ş. Hukuk İşleri Direktörü ve Etik Kurul Üyesi, BriSA Bridgestone Sabanci Lastik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.Ş. Yönetim Kurulu Üyesi, TurSA Sabanci Turizm ve Yatırım İsletmeleri A.Ş. Yönetim Kurulu Üyesi, Ankara Enternasyonel Otelcilik A.Ş. Yönetim Kurulu Üyesi, Exsa Export Sanayi Mamulleri Satış ve Araştırma A.Ş. Yönetim Kurulu Üyesi
|
No
|
|
|
Dependent Member
|
|
Not Considered
|
No
|
|
BURAK TURGUT ORHUN
|
|
Male
|
Member of the Board
|
Manager
|
02.10.2018
|
Non-Executive
|
|
|
Yes
|
|
|
Dependent Member
|
|
Not Considered
|
No
|
|
JEROME.M.G.GUILLAUME BEDİER
|
|
Male
|
Member of the Board
|
Manager
|
27.03.2018
|
Non-Executive
|
|
|
Yes
|
|
|
Dependent Member
|
|
Not Considered
|
No
|
Kurumsal Yönetim Komitesi Üyesi
|
GUILLAUME JACQUES EDGARD LAFFONT DE COLONGES
|
|
Male
|
Member of the Board
|
Manager
|
27.03.2018
|
Non-Executive
|
|
|
Yes
|
|
|
Dependent Member
|
|
Not Considered
|
No
|
|
DAVID MURCIANO
|
|
Male
|
Member of the Board
|
Manager
|
29.03.2019
|
Non-Executive
|
|
|
Yes
|
|
|
Dependent Member
|
|
Not Considered
|
No
|
|
MEHMET KAHYA
|
|
Male
|
Member of the Board
|
Manager
|
27.03.2018
|
Non-Executive
|
|
Brisa Bridgestone Sabancı Lastik Sanayi ve Ticaret A.Ş. Bağımsız Yönetim Kurulu Üyesi, Teknosa İç ve Dış Ticaret A.Ş. Bağımsız Yönetim Kurulu Üyesi, Electrosalus Biyomedikal A.Ş. Yönetim Kurulu Üyesi, Enerjeo Kemaliye Enerji Üretim A.Ş. ve Enerjeo Gediz Enerji Üretim A.Ş. hissedar danışmanı
|
Yes
|
|
|
Independent Member
|
https://www.kap.org.tr/tr/Bildirim/665413
|
Considered
|
No
|
Denetimden Sorumlu Komite Başkanı, Riskin Erken Saptanması Komitesi Üyesi
|
EMİN HAKAN EMİNSOY
|
|
Male
|
Member of the Board
|
Manager
|
02.10.2018
|
Non-Executive
|
|
Sardes Faktoring A.Ş. Yönetim Kurulu Başkanı, Tosyalı Holding A.Ş. Yönetim Kurulu Üyesi ve Aksigorta Bağımsız Yönetim Kurulu Üyesi
|
Yes
|
|
|
Independent Member
|
'https://www.kap.org.tr/tr/Bildirim/710346
|
Considered
|
No
|
Kurumsal Yönetim Komitesi Başkanı, Riskin Erken Saptanması Komitesi Başkanı, Denetim Komitesi Üyesi
|